Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Eastern Shore Local Government Consent - Repeal
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a requirement that a majority of the governments of certain Eastern Shore counties affected by the construction of a toll road, toll highway, or toll bridge consent to the construction does not apply to the construction of a toll road, toll highway, or toll bridge crossing the Chesapeake Bay.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0560
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/14/2017
Legislative Date
11/14/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/14/2017 11/14/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Eastern Shore Local Government Consent - Repeal
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 1/24 at 2:30 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM