Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Updating Advisory Boards and Councils
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health and Mental Hygiene)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 40
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a State Advisory Council on Health and Wellness to address chronic disease in the State by repealing and consolidating three existing State advisory councils that address physical fitness, arthritis, and heart disease and stroke; altering the membership of the State Child Fatality Review Team to include specified representatives; declaring the intent of the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/19/2016
Legislative Date
9/19/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2017
Legislative Date
1/10/2017
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {847772/1 Adopted
Proceedings
12
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
12
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
14
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
16
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {696080/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 40
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/19/2016 9/19/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Updating Advisory Boards and Councils
Senate 1/10/2017 1/10/2017 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments {847772/1 Adopted 12
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 12
Text - Third - Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Updating Advisory Boards and Councils
Senate 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 14
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Referred Health and Government Operations 16
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Favorable with Amendments {696080/1 Adopted 55
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 57
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 54
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 54
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Updating Advisory Boards and Councils
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 40
Text - Chapter - Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Updating Advisory Boards and Councils
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-201 through 13-206, 13-401, 13-402, 13-403 through 13-407, 13-408 through 13-410, 13-409, 13-502, 13-505 through 13-509, 13-510 through 13-512, 17-217, 17-2A-12, 18-108, 2-106, 21-2A-05, 4-219, 5-703 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM