Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Exemption From Department of Information Technology Oversight
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Stadium Authority)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 150
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting the Maryland Stadium Authority from certain provisions of law relating to the purchase, lease, or rental of information technology or any changes to the purchase, lease, or rental of information technology.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/19/2017
Legislative Date
9/19/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2018
Legislative Date
1/03/2018
Action
Hearing 1/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
3 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
3 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2018
Legislative Date
1/16/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
5 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 150
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/19/2017 9/19/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Maryland Stadium Authority - Exemption From Department of Information Technology Oversight
Senate 1/03/2018 1/03/2018 Hearing 1/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Favorable Adopted 3 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Second Reading Passed 3 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Stadium Authority - Exemption From Department of Information Technology Oversight
Senate 1/16/2018 1/16/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 5 Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 7 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 150
Text - Chapter - Maryland Stadium Authority - Exemption From Department of Information Technology Oversight
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page