Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Appointment of Dentist and Dental Hygienist Members - Advice and Consent of the Senate
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 528
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the dentist and dental hygienist members of the State Board of Dental Examiners to be appointed with the advice and consent of the Senate from a list of names submitted to the Governor by the Board.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
10/23/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {924539/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {416981/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-2)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 528
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 10/23/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/02/2016 2/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Favorable with Amendments {924539/1 Report Adopted 15
Senate 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15
Senate 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 17
House 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations 18
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Favorable with Amendments {416981/1 Report Adopted 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-2) 60
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendment 61
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Passed Enrolled 61
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 528
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-201, 4-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM