Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Maximum Speed Limits on Highways
Sponsored by
Senators Edwards, Astle, Cassilly, DeGrange, Eckardt, Getty, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Manno, Mathias, Middleton, Norman, Peters, Reilly, Salling, Shank, and Waugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 320
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing from 65 miles an hour to 70 miles an hour the maximum speed limit that may be established on specified highways in the State.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0194
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0157 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2015
Legislative Date
1/21/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2015
Legislative Date
1/27/2015
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (39-7)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-7)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 320
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2015 1/21/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2015 1/27/2015 Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2015 2/16/2015 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 24
Senate 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Second Reading Passed 24
Senate 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (39-7) 26
House 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation 28
House 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/10/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (130-7) 66
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 320
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-801.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM