Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Reporting Abuse to the Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program and the Office of Health Care Quality
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Aging)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying that suspected abuse of a resident of a related institution is required to be reported to the Office of Health Care Quality; requiring the recipient of a specified report to promptly notify, to the extent allowed by specified laws, the administrator of the related institution; requiring the Office of Health Care Quality once it has received a specified report to promptly notify the Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program; clarifying the entities to which a law enforcement agency is required to report the findings of an investigation; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/11/2016
Legislative Date
10/11/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2017
Legislative Date
1/10/2017
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {457970/1 Adopted
Proceedings
12
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
12
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
14
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
16
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {756782/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/11/2016 10/11/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Reporting Abuse to the Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program and the Office of Health Care Quality
Senate 1/10/2017 1/10/2017 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments {457970/1 Adopted 12
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 12
Text - Third - Reporting Abuse to the Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program and the Office of Health Care Quality
Senate 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 14
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Referred Health and Government Operations 16
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments {756782/1 Adopted 61
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 59
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Reporting Abuse to the Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program and the Office of Health Care Quality
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Text - Chapter - Reporting Abuse to the Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program and the Office of Health Care Quality
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-302 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM