Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Polling Places - Accommodations for Disabled Voters
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/23 at 2:45 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that, to the extent practicable, an election judge allow a disabled voter who is in a waiting line to vote to sit while waiting or move the disabled voter to the front of the waiting line.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0109
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
11/04/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2014
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 2:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 11/04/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/08/2014 1/08/2014 Hearing 1/23 at 2:45 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-308.1, 1-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM