Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Medicare Supplement Policies for Dual Eligible Individuals - Open Enrollment Period
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 42
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified health insurance carriers, under specified circumstances, to make available during a specified time period Medicare supplement policy plans A and C to individuals who are under the age of 65 years but are eligible for Medicare due to a disability; and repealing an obsolete provision of law relating to open enrollment in specified Medicare supplement policy plans for individuals terminated from the Maryland Health Insurance Plan.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/22/2016
Legislative Date
9/22/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2017
Legislative Date
1/05/2017
Action
Hearing 1/12 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
5
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
5
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
7
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
8
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 42
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/22/2016 9/22/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health Insurance - Medicare Supplement Policies for Dual Eligible Individuals - Open Enrollment Period
Senate 1/05/2017 1/05/2017 Hearing 1/12 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Favorable Adopted 5
Senate 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Second Reading Passed 5
Text - Third - Health Insurance - Medicare Supplement Policies for Dual Eligible Individuals - Open Enrollment Period
Senate 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 7
House 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 Referred Health and Government Operations 8
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 42
Text - Chapter - Health Insurance - Medicare Supplement Policies for Dual Eligible Individuals - Open Enrollment Period
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-909 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM