Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Heritage Areas Authority – Acquisition or Development Grants – Repeal of Target Investment Zones
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Planning)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 143
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the identification and use of "target investment zones" by the Maryland Heritage Areas Authority for certain acquisition and development grants in certified heritage areas; repealing certain provisions under which the Authority may make acquisition or development grants under certain circumstances; and repealing the definition of "target investment zone".
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2018
Legislative Date
11/01/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Heritage Areas Authority - Target Investment Zones - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Heritage Areas Authority - Target Investment Zones - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {850818/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 143
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2018 11/01/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Heritage Areas Authority - Target Investment Zones - Repeal
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable Adopted 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Heritage Areas Authority - Target Investment Zones - Repeal
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {850818/1 Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Heritage Areas Authority – Acquisition or Development Grants – Repeal of Target Investment Zones
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 143
Text - Chapter - Maryland Heritage Areas Authority – Acquisition or Development Grants – Repeal of Target Investment Zones
(   13-1101, 13-1113 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page