Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Obstruction Hanging From Rearview Mirror - Enforcement
Sponsored by
Senator Ramirez
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing for enforcement only as a secondary offense for a violation of the prohibition under specified circumstances against a person driving a vehicle on a highway with any object, material, or obstruction hanging from the rearview mirror that interferes with the clear view of the driver through the windshield.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0563
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0316 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
11/03/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/25/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
10
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
10
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-1)
Proceedings
12
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
13
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 11/03/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/21/2016 1/25/2016 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2016 1/26/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 10
Senate 1/26/2016 1/26/2016 Second Reading Passed 10
Senate 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Third Reading Passed (42-1) 12
House 1/29/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation 13
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-1104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM