Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Energy Performance Contracts
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Energy Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the Department of General Services is responsible for monitoring the status of certain energy performance contracts and reporting on that status to the Board of Public Works annually; requiring a primary procurement unit to consult with the Department before issuing a request for proposals for an energy performance contract; requiring the Department to review certain proposed requests for proposals for energy performance contracts; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019, October 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/08/2018
Legislative Date
11/08/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Finance and Procurement - Energy Performance Contracts
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Finance and Procurement - Energy Performance Contracts
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Finance and Procurement - Energy Performance Contracts
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/08/2018 11/08/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - State Finance and Procurement - Energy Performance Contracts
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Second Reading Passed 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Finance and Procurement - Energy Performance Contracts
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/22/2019 3/17/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2019 3/18/2019 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134
Text - Chapter - State Finance and Procurement - Energy Performance Contracts
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page