Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Witness - Facility and Therapy Dogs - Support
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a court in a criminal proceeding to allow a facility dog or therapy dog to accompany a child witness during testimony on motion by a party; requiring the motion to include the facility or therapy dog's credentials, proof of insurance for the facility or therapy dog, statements that an established relationship, in anticipation of testimony, exists between the child and facility or therapy dog and that the dog's presence is expected to reduce anxiety experienced by the child witness during testimony; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
7/30/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2016
Legislative Date
1/07/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 7/30/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/21 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/07/2016 1/07/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM