Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Solid Waste Management Practices - Maryland Recycling and Landfill Diversion Task Force
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each county and the Department of the Environment to adopt a specified solid waste management hierarchy; declaring the intent of the General Assembly that the State undertake specified actions relating to recycling and landfill disposal rates; establishing the Maryland Recycling and Landfill Diversion Task Force; requiring the Task Force to determine the statewide recycling goal and a recycling and landfill portfolio standard that will reduce the amount of solid waste being sent to landfills; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0240
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014, October 1, 2014
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
11/06/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 11/06/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/24/2014 1/24/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/24/2014 1/24/2014 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2014 3/21/2014 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-504 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM