Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Environmental Impact Study - Cost Estimate and Payment
Sponsored by
Senators Mathias, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Kelley, Klausmeier, Middleton, Norman, and Pugh
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Stating the power of the Maryland Transportation Authority to conduct or coordinate a study of the environmental impact of proposed transportation facilities; requiring the Maryland Transportation Authority, in collaboration with specified other agencies, to develop a cost estimate for an environmental impact study for a third crossing of the Chesapeake Bay; requiring the Maryland Transportation Authority to set aside the greater of $1,000,000 or 5% of the cost estimate each year for the environmental impact study, as specified; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0902 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
11/04/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {667077/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-3)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 11/04/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2016 3/21/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments {667077/1 Report Adopted 47A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (41-3) 48A
House 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation 52
House 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-205, 4-407 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM