Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Office of the State's Attorney - Dorchester County - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators
Sponsored by
Senator Colburn
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the State's Attorney for Dorchester County to appoint criminal investigators, subject to the approval of the Dorchester County Council; authorizing the State's Attorney for Dorchester County to designate a chief investigator and assign other ranks and titles to other criminal investigators; providing that a criminal investigator who is appointed under the Act shall serve at the pleasure of the State's Attorney for Dorchester County; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0390
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
11/07/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2014
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
29
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 11/07/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/08/2014 1/08/2014 Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 2/14/2014 2/17/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2014 2/17/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 27
Senate 2/17/2014 2/17/2014 Second Reading Passed 27
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 29
House 2/20/2014 2/20/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters 32
House 3/27/2014 3/27/2014 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2014 4/02/2014 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 62
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 63
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM