Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Payroll Taxes on Employee Tips
Sponsored by
Senator Mathias
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/29 at 1:45 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland individual and corporate income tax in the amount of the reduction of a federal income tax deduction for social security and Medicare taxes paid on behalf of employees that receive tips; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2013; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0387
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
11/07/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/2014
Legislative Date
1/01/2014
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 11/07/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/01/2014 1/01/2014 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:45 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-207, 10-307 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM