Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Notices and Orders - E-Mail
Sponsored by
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Assessments and Taxation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the supervisor of assessments for a county to e-mail certain notices to the owner or resident agent of certain income producing properties if the recipient, within the past 3 years, has provided the Department of Assessments and Taxation with an e-mail address and requested to receive the notices by e-mail; authorizing the Department to send certain notices by e-mail under certain circumstances; authorizing the supervisor to serve a certain notice by e-mail under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/02/2018
Legislative Date
10/02/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2019
Legislative Date
1/03/2019
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2019
Legislative Date
1/07/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2019
Legislative Date
1/07/2019
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 10:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {939034/1 Adopted
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/02/2018 10/02/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Notices and Orders - E-Mail
Senate 1/03/2019 1/03/2019 Hearing 1/17 at 1:45 p.m.
Senate 1/07/2019 1/07/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/07/2019 1/07/2019 Hearing 1/17 at 10:30 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments {939034/1 Adopted 22
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 22
Text - Third - State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Notices and Orders - E-Mail
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 24
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Referred Ways and Means 26
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53A
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 54
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Text - Chapter - State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Notices and Orders - E-Mail
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-507, 14-510, 8-105, 8-402, 8-409, 8-419 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM