Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Health and Safety (Sugar-Free Schools Act)
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring specified county boards of education to develop a plan on or before August 1, 2018, for reducing students' total sugar intake per school meal based on specified recommendations; requiring each county board to convene a workgroup to study the best practices of other jurisdictions to lower students' total sugar intake per school meal, consider whether the results of the study would be appropriate in the local school system, and make recommendations to the county board based on specified information; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0065 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/05/2016
Legislative Date
10/05/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2017
Legislative Date
1/06/2017
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2017
Legislative Date
1/12/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2017
Legislative Date
1/12/2017
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/05/2016 10/05/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Primary and Secondary Education - Health and Safety (Sugar-Free Schools Act)
Senate 1/06/2017 1/06/2017 Hearing 1/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/12/2017 1/12/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/12/2017 1/12/2017 Hearing 1/25 at 3:00 p.m.
Senate 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-440 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM