Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Driver's Licenses - Expiration and Renewal
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 138
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a requirement that a corrected driver's license expire at the end of a certain time period; and altering the period of time, from 6 to 9 years, within which certain drivers are required to have taken an authorized vision test to qualify for renewal of a driver's license.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/04/2018
Legislative Date
10/04/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Driver's Licenses - Expiration and Renewal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Driver's Licenses - Expiration and Renewal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 138
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws - Driver's Licenses - Expiration and Renewal
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/04/2018 10/04/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Driver's Licenses - Expiration and Renewal
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Favorable Adopted 15
Senate 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Second Reading Passed 15
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Driver's Licenses - Expiration and Renewal
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 17
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation 18
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 59
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 138
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws - Driver's Licenses - Expiration and Renewal
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-114.1, 16-115 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM