Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Period - Emergency Preparedness Equipment
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a tax-free period beginning in calendar year 2017 for the sale of emergency preparedness items; providing the 7-day period from the second Sunday in August through the following Saturday as the period during which a sales and use tax exemption for the sale of specified items is provided; requiring the Comptroller of the Treasury to publish a specified list on or before January 1, 2017; authorizing the Comptroller to amend the list of emergency preparedness equipment that is exempt from taxation for each subsequent tax-free period; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
11/05/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 11/05/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
(   11-228.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page