Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Chiropractic Act - Revisions
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 658
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a requirement that the State Board of Chiropractic Examiners issue paper copies of licenses; prohibiting, under certain circumstances, an applicant for a license to practice chiropractic from being required under a certain provision of law to hold a bachelor's degree; requiring the Central Repository to provide the Board with a revised printed statement of an individual's criminal history record under certain circumstances; requiring the Board to maintain an electronic roster of each individual licensed; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/27/2017
Legislative Date
9/27/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Chiropractic Act - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2018
Legislative Date
1/03/2018
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {784336/1 Adopted
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Chiropractic Act - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {566684/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Chiropractic Act - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 658
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Chiropractic Act - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/27/2017 9/27/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Maryland Chiropractic Act - Revisions
Senate 1/03/2018 1/03/2018 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments {784336/1 Adopted 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Chiropractic Act - Revisions
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 17 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments {566684/1 Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 61AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Chiropractic Act - Revisions
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 658
Text - Chapter - Maryland Chiropractic Act - Revisions
(   3-101, 3-301, 3-302, 3-302.1, 3-305.1, 3-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page