Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Laws Relating to Representation of Indigent Criminal Defendants by the Office of the Public Defender - Extension
Sponsored by
Senator Getty (Task Force to Study Laws Relating to Representation of Indigent Criminal Defendants by the Office of the Public Defender)
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the date by which the Task Force to Study the Laws Relating to Representation of Indigent Criminal Defendants by the Office of the Public Defender is required to submit specified findings and recommendations; and extending the termination date of the Task Force.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0023
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
11/12/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 11/12/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/08/2014 3/10/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM