Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
Sponsored by
Baltimore County Senators
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing provisions of law that establish the annual compensation of the judges of the Orphans' Court for Baltimore County; requiring the annual compensation of the judges of the Orphans' Court for Baltimore County to be as set by the County Executive and the County Council in accordance with specified provisions of the Baltimore County Code; applying the Act to the salary or compensation of the judges of the Orphans' Court for Baltimore County at the beginning of the next following term of office with specified exceptions; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0009
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0831 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
11/05/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2016
Legislative Date
1/07/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/27/2016
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/18/2017 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 12/16/2015 11/05/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/21 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/07/2016 1/07/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 29
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Second Reading Passed 29
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 31
House 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations 33
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/23/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 54
House 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Second Reading Passed 54
House 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 55
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Returned Passed 53
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/27/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM