Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Claim Processing - Electronic Delivery of Decisions
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Workers' Compensation Commission)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 16
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a copy of specified decisions by the Workers' Compensation Commission may be sent by electronic means to a party or the party's attorney of record under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
10/04/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2013
Legislative Date
1/07/2013
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
7
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
7
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
8A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/22/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
10
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 16
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2012 10/04/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/07/2013 1/07/2013 Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/15/2013 1/16/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/17/2013 1/17/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 7
Senate 1/17/2013 1/17/2013 Second Reading Passed 7
Senate 1/21/2013 1/18/2013 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 8A
House 1/22/2013 1/22/2013 First Reading Economic Matters 10
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 57
House 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Second Reading Passed 57
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 59
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 16
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-308, 9-714 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM