Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Retail Service Stations - Video Cameras Required
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each retail service station dealer to maintain at least one operational video camera on the exterior of the premises of the service station for the purpose of recording illegal activity; requiring that the video camera be capable of recording an image of an individual that is of sufficient quality to enable identification of the individual for the purpose of investigation or prosecution of suspected illegal activity; establishing a penalty for a violation of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1196
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
11/04/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2014
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 11/04/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/08/2014 1/08/2014 Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM