Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Mental Hygiene - Standards for Emergency Evaluation and Involuntary Admission - Modification
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Modifying specified standards for involuntary admissions of individuals with mental disorders to specified facilities or a Veterans' Administration hospital under specified circumstances; modifying specified standards for emergency evaluations of individuals with mental disorders under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0606
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
11/13/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2014
Legislative Date
1/14/2014
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 11/13/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/14/2014 1/14/2014 Hearing 1/22 at 1:45 p.m.
Senate 1/16/2014 1/16/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2014 3/10/2014 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-601, 10-617, 10-622, 10-623, 10-626, 10-632 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM