Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Orders of Summary Suspension - Stays
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a stay if a licensed funeral establishment notes an appeal from an order of summary suspension by the State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors; authorizing a stay if a specified licensee notes an appeal from an order of summary suspension by the Board; requiring a court to provide notice of an opportunity to be heard to specified parties before staying a specified order; and prohibiting a court from staying a specified order if, after a hearing, the court makes a specified finding.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0098
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {674633/1
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Special Order until 3/19 (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {674633/1
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {674633/1
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {674633/1
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-9)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2015 1/23/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Favorable with Amendments {674633/1 44
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Special Order until 3/19 (Senator Conway) Adopted 44
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments {674633/1 46
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Conway) Adopted 46
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments {674633/1 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Conway) Adopted 47
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments {674633/1 47A
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Committee Amendment Adopted 47A
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 47A
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (37-9) 48
House 3/25/2015 3/23/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations 53
House 3/26/2015 3/26/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-319, 7-320 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM