Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws – HOV Lanes – Hybrid Vehicles
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing certain provisions of law authorizing certain qualified hybrid vehicles to use a high occupancy vehicle (HOV) lane along a certain highway regardless of the number of passengers in the vehicle.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): September 29, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/04/2018
Legislative Date
10/04/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - HOV Lanes - Plug-In Electric Drive and Hybrid Vehicles
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {938572/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws – HOV Lanes – Hybrid Vehicles
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-2)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws – HOV Lanes – Hybrid Vehicles
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/04/2018 10/04/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - HOV Lanes - Plug-In Electric Drive and Hybrid Vehicles
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Favorable with Amendments {938572/1 Adopted 15
Senate 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws – HOV Lanes – Hybrid Vehicles
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 17
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation 18
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-2) 59
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws – HOV Lanes – Hybrid Vehicles
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-314, 25-108 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM