Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Support Enforcement - Attachment and Seizure of Retirement Accounts and Claims Against Retirement Plans
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Human Resources)
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Including retirement accounts in the definition of "account" in provisions relating to information and assistance by financial institutions to the Child Support Enforcement Administration; altering an exemption for specified retirement plans from the claims of creditors to allow claims for purposes of child support enforcement; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2012
Legislative Date
11/15/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/02/2013
Legislative Date
1/02/2013
Action
Hearing 1/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {488179/1
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Frosh) Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-2)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2012 11/15/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/02/2013 1/02/2013 Hearing 1/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/01/2013 3/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Favorable with Amendments {488179/1 39
Senate 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Committee Amendment Adopted 39
Senate 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Frosh) Adopted 39
Senate 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 39
Senate 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Third Reading Passed (45-2) 42
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 First Reading Judiciary 45
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-108.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM