Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Value of Easement
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Agriculture)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, notwithstanding specified provisions of law, and with a specified exception, the Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation from purchasing an agricultural land preservation easement for more than 75% or less than 25% of the fair market value of the land; and authorizing the Foundation to purchase an easement for less than 25% of the fair market value of the land if the asking price is less than 25% of the fair market value of the land.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
9/13/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2014
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
8
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Special Order until 1/20 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
8
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
8A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
8A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
10
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
12
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 9/13/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/08/2014 1/08/2014 Hearing 1/14 at 3:00 p.m.
Senate 1/15/2014 1/16/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 Favorable 8
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 Special Order until 1/20 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 8
Senate 1/20/2014 1/17/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 8A
Senate 1/20/2014 1/17/2014 Second Reading Passed 8A
Senate 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 10
House 1/23/2014 1/23/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters 12
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/26/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 Second Reading Passed 58
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 59
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12
(   2-511 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page