Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Damage to Highways from Overweight or Oversized Vehicles - Liability and Penalties
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 176
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying that a person who drives or moves overweight vehicle loads on a municipal highway is liable for specified damage caused to the highway; establishing that a person who drives or moves oversized loads on State, county, or municipal highways is liable for all resulting damage caused to the highways; establishing an exception if an overweight or oversize vehicle is operated in accordance with a specified permit; establishing a maximum civil penalty applicable to a person who causes specified damage to specified highways; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2012
Legislative Date
11/15/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/02/2013
Legislative Date
1/02/2013
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {978673/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/05/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
20
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {170219/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 176
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2012 11/15/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/02/2013 1/02/2013 Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/01/2013 2/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2013 2/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments {978673/1 Report Adopted 18
Senate 2/05/2013 2/05/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 18
Senate 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 20
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters 23
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable with Amendments {170219/1 Report Adopted 62
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) 64
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendments 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Passed Enrolled 66
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 176
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM