Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Weight and Axle Load Limits
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 13
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting specified buses from provisions of law establishing tanden axle weight limits; clarifying that specified vehicle weight limits apply to specified buses; and increasing to 550 pounds the weight limit tolerance for the use of specified equipment that promotes fuel economy and reduced emissions.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
9/30/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/2014
Legislative Date
1/01/2014
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {848975/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 13
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 9/30/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/01/2014 1/01/2014 Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/07/2014 2/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {848975/1 Report Adopted 23
Senate 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23
Senate 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 25
House 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters 28
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 64
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 13
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-109, 24-113.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM