Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective Bargaining
Sponsored by
Harford County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 647
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that full-time deputy sheriffs at the rank of captain and below and full-time correctional officers at the rank of captain and below in the Office of the Sheriff of Harford County have the right to organize and negotiate with the Harford County Executive and Harford County Sheriff with regard to certain wages and employee health care premium share; requiring the right to organize and negotiate to be conducted in accordance with certain provisions of the Harford County Code unless otherwise provided in the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0083
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/10/2017
Legislative Date
10/10/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {217170/1 Adopted
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-3)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 647
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/10/2017 10/10/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Harford County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective Bargaining
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {217170/1 Adopted 20
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 20
Text - Third - Harford County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective Bargaining
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 22
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Referred Appropriations 23
House 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (133-3) 57
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 647
Text - Chapter - Harford County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective Bargaining
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM