Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Code - Standardization of Terminology - Nonprofits
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 631
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Making stylistic changes to various provisions of law to standardize the terminology used to refer to nonprofit persons where appropriate; and providing that, except as expressly stated in the Act, the Act shall be construed as a nonsubstantive revision and does not render any substantive change in the law of the State.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/28/2016
Legislative Date
10/28/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Code - Standardization of Terminology - Nonprofits
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2017
Legislative Date
1/10/2017
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
8A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
8A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Code - Standardization of Terminology - Nonprofits
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
10
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
12
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 631
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Code - Standardization of Terminology - Nonprofits
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/28/2016 10/28/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Code - Standardization of Terminology - Nonprofits
Senate 1/10/2017 1/10/2017 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/23/2017 1/20/2017 Favorable Adopted 8A
Senate 1/23/2017 1/20/2017 Second Reading Passed 8A
Text - Third - Maryland Code - Standardization of Terminology - Nonprofits
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 10
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 Referred Health and Government Operations 12
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 631
Text - Chapter - Maryland Code - Standardization of Terminology - Nonprofits
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 12-104, 31-1306 )
(   11-526, 11-902, 17-1402, 17-905, 19-701, 3-403, 5-102, 5-602 )
(   23-101 )
(   10-101, 10-115, 10-301, 10-403, 10-424, 10-454, 10-473, 10-502, 10-601, 10-807, 10-835, 10-903, 11-203, 12-101, 12-109, 12-406, 13-405, 13-408, 13-504, 13-733, 15-101, 2.5-106, 4-701, 5-1201, 5-1202, 5-1203, 5-1204, 5-1205, 5-203, 5-301, 5-320, 5-324, 5-401 )
(   14-105 )
(   4-320, 5-716 )
(   12-104, 12-502, 6-401 )
(   14-103, 27-802, 5-511 )
(   3-203, 3-403, 3-415, 3-420, 7-101, 8-101, 8-203, 8-217, 8-220, 8-222, 8-303, 8-610, 8-616, 8-617, 8-618, 8-620, 8-621, 8-622 )
(   17-113 )
(   5-1203, 8-1915 )
(   10-102, 1-101, 9-208 )
(   13-110, 14-301, 14-302 )
(   10-208, 4-103, 4-104, 4-301, 9-314 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM