Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Dorchester County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization
Sponsored by
Senator Colburn
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Dorchester County Sanitary Commission to request the county tax collector to conduct a sale of real property to enforce a lien representing any unpaid benefit assessment or other specified charges, in accordance with the same procedures governing the sale of property for delinquent property taxes; and authorizing the tax collector in Dorchester County to conduct a county tax sale for the purpose of enforcing a specified lien.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0180
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
10/15/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/2014
Legislative Date
1/01/2014
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
14
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/28/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
14
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
16
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 10/15/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/01/2014 1/01/2014 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/28/2014 1/28/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 14
Senate 1/28/2014 1/28/2014 Second Reading Passed 14
Senate 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 16
House 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters 18
House 3/27/2014 3/27/2014 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 64
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-658 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM