Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Advisory Councils - Renaming and Termination
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health and Mental Hygiene)
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Renaming the State Advisory Council on Heart Disease and Stroke to be the State Advisory Council on Chronic Disease Prevention, Physical Fitness, and Healthy Eating; altering the duties and membership of the Advisory Council; requiring the membership of the Advisory Council to represent specified diversity of the State; altering the length of a member's term and the number of times the Advisory Council must meet each year; requiring the Advisory Council to create subcommittees to address specified topic areas; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2012
Legislative Date
10/04/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2013
Legislative Date
1/07/2013
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {917374/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/05/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
20
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2012 10/04/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/07/2013 1/07/2013 Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/04/2013 2/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/05/2013 2/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments {917374/1 Report Adopted 18
Senate 2/05/2013 2/05/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 18
Senate 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 20
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations 23
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-409 )
(   13-201 through 13-206, 13-401 through 13-410, 13-502, 13-505 through 13-509, 13-510, 13-511, 13-512 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM