Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Disclosure of Prescription Monitoring Data
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health and Mental Hygiene)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 177
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding the Division of Drug Control of the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to the list of units of the Department to which the Prescription Drug Monitoring Program must disclose prescription monitoring data under specified circumstances.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2012
Legislative Date
10/04/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2013
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2013
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2013
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/21/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/22/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
9
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/22/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
9
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
11
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
13
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 177
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2012 10/04/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/08/2013 1/08/2013 Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/09/2013 1/09/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/09/2013 1/09/2013 Hearing 1/17 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/18/2013 1/21/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/22/2013 1/22/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 9
Senate 1/22/2013 1/22/2013 Second Reading Passed 9
Senate 1/24/2013 1/24/2013 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 11
House 1/25/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations 13
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2013 4/06/2013 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 66
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Second Reading Passed 66
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 177
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-2A-06 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM