Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Property Tax Credit - Buc's Pleasure Club
Sponsored by
Senator Getty
Status
In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Carroll County to grant a property tax credit for specified real property owned by Buc's Pleasure Club; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2015.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2015
Legislative Date
1/26/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2015
Legislative Date
1/29/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2015 1/26/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/29/2015 1/29/2015 Hearing cancelled
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM