Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Interstate Boating Violator Compact
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Governor to enter into the Interstate Boating Violator Compact; providing that the purposes of the Compact are to provide a means for party states to participate in a specified reciprocal program and to provide for the fair and impartial treatment of boating violators operating within party states; providing for a Board of Boating Compact Administrators for specified purposes; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to adopt specified regulations; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0123 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/12/2016
Legislative Date
10/12/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Interstate Boating Violator Compact
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2017
Legislative Date
1/04/2017
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Interstate Boating Violator Compact
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/14 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/12/2016 10/12/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Interstate Boating Violator Compact
Senate 1/04/2017 1/04/2017 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Favorable Adopted 18
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Second Reading Passed 18
Text - Third - Interstate Boating Violator Compact
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Motion Special Order until 2/14 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 20
Senate 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 23
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 26
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-801 through 8-804 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM