Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Vibrio Public Information Campaign
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 322
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment, after specified consultation, to develop and implement a specified public information campaign about the health risks associated with the Vibrio bacteria in the waters of the State on or before June 15, 2015; requiring the public information campaign to identify specified information relevant to Vibrio and Vibrio infections, to implement processes to ensure the medical community is properly notified and prepared for a Vibrio infection, and to provide a Web site for additional information; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2015
Legislative Date
1/26/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2015
Legislative Date
1/26/2015
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {770318/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-1)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 322
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2015 1/26/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/26/2015 1/26/2015 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2015 2/16/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 24
Senate 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Second Reading Passed 24
Senate 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 26
House 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation 28
House 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable with Amendments {770318/1 Report Adopted 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/10/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-1) 66
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendments 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 322
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM