Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Port Commission - Management Personnel Appointments - Operating and Managing Port Facilities
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 21
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Port Commission to determine the qualifications for appointment and the compensation and benefits for up to 12 management personnel positions required to operate and manage State-owned port facilities; establishing that those employees are State employees; recodifying provisions of law relating to specified management employees; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/02/2013
Legislative Date
11/15/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/02/2013
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2013
Legislative Date
1/07/2013
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
7
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
7
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
8A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/22/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
10
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 21
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/02/2013 11/15/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 1/02/2013 1/09/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/07/2013 1/07/2013 Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/15/2013 1/16/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/17/2013 1/17/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 7
Senate 1/17/2013 1/17/2013 Second Reading Passed 7
Senate 1/21/2013 1/18/2013 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 8A
House 1/22/2013 1/22/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters 10
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 59
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 62
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Returned Passed 61A
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 21
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-201.2, 6-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM