Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tuition Waivers - Foster Care Recipients - Eligibility
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Human Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 369
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the eligibility requirements for tuition waivers for foster care recipients to include individuals who resided in an out-of-home placement on or after the individual's 13th birthday for at least 1 year and reunited with at least one of the individual's parents; and altering the length of time from 5 to 10 years during which certain individuals continue to be exempt from certain tuition.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/27/2017
Legislative Date
9/27/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Tuition Waivers - Foster Care Recipients - Eligibility
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2018
Legislative Date
1/03/2018
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {184634/1 Adopted
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Tuition Waivers - Foster Care Recipients - Eligibility
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2018
Legislative Date
1/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 369
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Tuition Waivers - Foster Care Recipients - Eligibility
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/27/2017 9/27/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Tuition Waivers - Foster Care Recipients - Eligibility
Senate 1/03/2018 1/03/2018 Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments {184634/1 Adopted 8 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 8 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Tuition Waivers - Foster Care Recipients - Eligibility
Senate 1/23/2018 1/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 10 Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Referred Appropriations 11 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/09/2018 3/12/2018 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 369
Text - Chapter - Tuition Waivers - Foster Care Recipients - Eligibility
(   15-106.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page