Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Charitable Organizations - Registration Late Fees - Distribution and Use
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Secretary of State)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 668
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring $100 of the annual fees as well as the late fees paid by a charitable organization for failure to timely file a registration that are collected by the Secretary of State to be distributed to the Charitable Enforcement Fund, to be used to support the actions of the Secretary of State and the Attorney General to carry out certain duties relating to the protection of charitable assets and the enforcement of the Maryland Solicitations Act.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/13/2017
Legislative Date
9/13/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2018
Legislative Date
1/04/2018
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
13
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
13
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
15
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
16
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 668
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/13/2017 9/13/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Charitable Organizations - Registration Late Fees - Distribution and Use
Senate 1/04/2018 1/04/2018 Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Favorable Adopted 13
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Second Reading Passed 13
Text - Third - Charitable Organizations - Registration Late Fees - Distribution and Use
Senate 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 15
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Referred Economic Matters 16
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 57
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 668
Text - Chapter - Charitable Organizations - Registration Late Fees - Distribution and Use
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM