Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Drunk Driving - Ignition Interlock System Program - Repeat Offenders
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 17
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that the Motor Vehicle Administration impose a specified period of suspension to be served before participation in the Ignition Interlock System Program when modifying a specified suspension imposed on specified repeat drunk or drugged driving offenders; prohibiting specified repeat drunk or drugged driving offenders from operating a motor vehicle in the course of employment without installation of an ignition interlock system; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
9/30/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/2014
Legislative Date
1/01/2014
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
19
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-1)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 17
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 9/30/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/01/2014 1/01/2014 Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/24/2014 1/28/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 15
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Second Reading Passed 15
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 17
House 2/03/2014 2/03/2014 First Reading Judiciary 19
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 61
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (131-1) 62
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 17
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-205, 27-107 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM