Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Standard Deduction - Alteration
Sponsored by
Senator Serafini
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the minimum and maximum limitation amounts of the standard deduction allowed under the Maryland income tax; providing that a certain cost-of-living adjustment applicable to the minimum and maximum limitation amounts of certain standard deductions applies beginning with taxable year 2020; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0271
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/16/2018
Legislative Date
11/16/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Standard Deduction - Alteration
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2019
Legislative Date
1/11/2019
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/16/2018 11/16/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax - Standard Deduction - Alteration
Senate 1/11/2019 1/11/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-217 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM