Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consolidation of Nondepository Special Funds
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Consolidating the Mortgage Lender-Originator Fund, the Money Transmission Fund, and the Debt Management Services Fund into a single fund known as the Nondepository Special Fund; providing the purpose of the Nondepository Special Fund is to cover the direct and indirect costs of fulfilling the statutory and regulatory duties of the Commissioner under specified circumstances; requiring specified revenues, fees, and examination assessments to be credited to the Nondepository Special Fund to be used for a specified purpose; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2015
Legislative Date
10/27/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {757573/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
7
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
7
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
9
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
10
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {383791/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2015 10/27/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 1/19/2016 1/20/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Favorable with Amendments {757573/1 Report Adopted 7
Senate 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 7
Senate 1/25/2016 1/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 9
House 1/26/2016 1/26/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 10
House 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable with Amendments {383791/1 Report Adopted 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0) 68
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendment 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Passed Enrolled 66
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-503.2, 11-601, 11-610, 12-404, 12-901, 12-905 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM