Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Land Use - Magnetic Levitation Transportation System
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from constructing a magnetic levitation transportation system or certain facilities or structures in the regional district in Prince George's County unless the district council reviews and approves the construction; and prohibiting a unit of State or local government from approving the construction, or condemnation for the construction, unless the district council reviews and approves the construction.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/24/2017
Legislative Date
10/24/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2018
Legislative Date
1/03/2018
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2018
Legislative Date
1/04/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/24/2017 10/24/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Prince George's County - Land Use - Magnetic Levitation Transportation System
Senate 1/03/2018 1/03/2018 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/04/2018 1/04/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   25-101, 25-214 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page