Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Vessel Excise Tax - Waterway Improvement Fund
Sponsored by
Senator Astle
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Limiting the amount of the vessel excise tax to $15,000 for any vessel; altering the distribution of motor fuel tax revenue; requiring the Comptroller, after making specified distributions, to distribute 0.5% of the revenue to the Waterway Improvement Fund; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to submit reports describing the effect of the limitation on the vessel excise tax; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0548
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1043 Session: 2002 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2013
Legislative Date
1/10/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {609634/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {335669/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {145560/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (129-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments (34-12)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-11)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/09/2013 1/10/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/31/2013 1/31/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/31/2013 1/31/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/27/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Favorable with Amendments {609634/1 Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 56
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 59
House 4/02/2013 4/02/2013 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/03/2013 4/03/2013 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable with Amendments {335669/1 Report Adopted 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Floor Committee Amendment {145560/1 Adopted 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (129-0) 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendments (34-12) 64
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed (36-11) 64
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Passed Enrolled 64
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-1104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM