Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - State-Identified HIV Priorities
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health and Mental Hygiene)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 46
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring rebates received by the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene from the Maryland AIDS Drug Assistance Program as a result of State General Fund expenditures to be distributed to a specified special nonlapsing fund and used only to fund State-identified priorities for HIV prevention, surveillance, and care; requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to adopt regulations establishing, as appropriate, income and other eligibility criteria for the receipt of specified HIV prevention and care services.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2015
Legislative Date
10/21/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/25/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {877471/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
10
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
10
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
12
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
13
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-3)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/12/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 46
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2015 10/21/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/22/2016 1/25/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 1/26/2016 1/26/2016 Favorable with Amendments {877471/1 Report Adopted 10
Senate 1/26/2016 1/26/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 10
Senate 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 12
House 1/29/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations 13
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed (134-3) 63
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/12/2016 4/12/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 46
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM