Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Recreational Incentives Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Natural Resources)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 22
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Recreational Incentives Pilot Program in the Department of Natural Resources; stating that the purpose of the pilot program is to determine whether incentive discounts offered to specified individuals increase the purchase of recreational hunting and fishing licenses; requiring the Department to develop a plan to implement the pilot program, subject to requirements and restrictions; requiring the Department to implement the pilot program in accordance with the developed plan; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
9/30/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2014
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
8
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
8
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/21/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
9
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
11
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 22
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 9/30/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/08/2014 1/08/2014 Hearing 1/14 at 3:00 p.m.
Senate 1/15/2014 1/16/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 8
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 Second Reading Passed 8
Senate 1/21/2014 1/21/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 9
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters 11
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2014 4/02/2014 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 62
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 63
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 22
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM